Councillor Dominic Stanford GeneralRoleCommittees Elected: 06 May 2021 First Elected 06 May 2021 Party: Ward: Role Title: Role Details: Election History ElectedRetiredReason Thu 6 May 2021 Tue 31 May 2022 Left BCC Party Representation History PartyFromTo ConservativeThu 6 May 2021 Tue 31 May 2022 Ward Representation History WardFromTo QuintonThu 6 May 2021 Tue 31 May 2022 Current Committee Memberships Committee - Date JoinedRole There are no current committees for this member. Past Committee Memberships Past Committee - Date JoinedPast RolePast Leaving Date Council as Trustee - 07 May 2021 Member31 May 2022 Planning Committee - 22 June 2021 Member05 May 2022 Meeting of the City Council - 07 May 2021 Member05 May 2022 Current Outside Body Appointments Outside BodyJoining Date There are no current outside bodies for this member. Past Outside Body Appointments Past Outside BodyPast Joining DatePast Leaving Date There are no past outside bodies for this member. Personal Register of Interests Date of NoticeReceipt by Monitoring OfficerView There are no register of interest records for this member. Meeting Declarations Committee NameMeeting DateNatureView There are no meeting declarations for this member. DateTitleNotes There are no training records for this member. DateFromDescriptionValue There are no hospitality and gift records for this member. Member Attendance Display attendance in date range From: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * To: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * * Attendance Summary SummaryCountPercentage Expected attendances0 Present as expected00% Absent00% Apologies received00% of absences In attendance (as a visitor)0 Attendance Details Meeting DateCommitteeAttendance There are no attendance records for this member in the selected date range.